Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Aage Strobel | 01.08.1989 | 18.02.1992 | direktion |
Jakub Wajnsztajn | 01.08.1989 | 18.02.1992 | direktion |
Gilles Christian Rene Caussade | 01.08.1989 | 07.08.1990 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.08.1989 | 12.12.1989 | direktion |