Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Verner Thomsen | 01.08.1989 | 09.04.1992 | direktion |
Villy Buhl Hansen | 01.08.1989 | 04.02.1991 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.08.1989 | 22.12.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Villy Buhl Hansen | 01.08.1989 | 09.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Verner Thomsen | 01.08.1989 | 09.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Egon Steenberg Sarud | 01.08.1989 | 09.04.1992 | formand |
Thomas Ivan Kruse | 01.08.1989 | 04.02.1991 | bestyrelse |
Paul Thoft Steninge | 01.08.1989 | 04.02.1991 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.08.1989 | 22.12.1989 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.08.1989 | 22.12.1989 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.08.1989 | 22.12.1989 | formand |