Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Boesen | 13.04.2011 | 08.10.2019 | direktion |
Poul Erik Kroll Larsen | 20.08.1989 | 13.04.2011 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Erik Kroll Larsen | 20.08.1989 | 18.11.1996 | bestyrelse |
Hanne Lykke Abildgaard | 20.08.1989 | 18.11.1996 | bestyrelse |
Annette Hammerlund Wilson | 20.08.1989 | 18.11.1996 | formand |