Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Sidenius Gram | 01.07.1989 | 17.12.1996 | direktion |
Dan Rybak | 01.07.1989 | 01.05.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kaj Ejvind Johansen | 01.07.1989 | 09.08.1991 | bestyrelse |
Søren Alrøe | 01.07.1989 | 09.08.1991 | bestyrelse |
Henning Dalsgaard Sørensen | 01.07.1989 | 09.08.1991 | bestyrelse |
Erik Dencker | 01.07.1989 | 26.10.1990 | bestyrelse |
Frank Marius Brosbøll Frandsen | 01.07.1989 | 26.10.1990 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Wistoft | 01.07.1989 | 26.10.1990 | bestyrelse |