Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Dimitre Vassilev Popov | 01.07.1989 | 20.06.2001 | direktion |
Peter Reimesch Koefoed | 01.07.1989 | 29.11.1993 | direktion |
Bernt Hjorth | 01.07.1989 | 01.06.1993 | direktion |
Steen Uhrskov | 01.07.1989 | 08.01.1993 | direktion |
Bernt Hjorth | 01.07.1989 | 08.01.1993 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1989 | 21.02.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Dimitre Vassilev Popov | 01.07.1989 | 20.06.2001 | bestyrelse |
Per Ganesh Nilakantan | 01.07.1989 | 20.06.2001 | bestyrelse |
Bengt Hubertus Harboe-Schmidt | 01.07.1989 | 20.06.2001 | bestyrelse |
Peter Reimesch Koefoed | 01.07.1989 | 29.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Lone Christensen | 01.07.1989 | 29.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Bjørn Stiedl | 01.07.1989 | 29.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Malby | 01.07.1989 | 01.06.1993 | bestyrelse |
Steen Uhrskov | 01.07.1989 | 01.06.1993 | bestyrelse |
Bernt Hjorth | 01.07.1989 | 01.06.1993 | bestyrelse |
Steen Uhrskov | 01.07.1989 | 08.01.1993 | bestyrelse |
Bernt Hjorth | 01.07.1989 | 08.01.1993 | bestyrelse |
Michael Christian Knudsen | 01.07.1989 | 08.01.1993 | bestyrelse |
Alex Stougaard Nielsen | 01.07.1989 | 08.01.1993 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Nicolai Holten | 01.07.1989 | 08.01.1993 | formand |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.07.1989 | 21.02.1990 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1989 | 21.02.1990 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.07.1989 | 21.02.1990 | formand |