Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Wenche Hjorth Melchiors | 01.07.1989 | 16.12.2004 | direktion |
Henrik Christian Melchiors | 01.07.1989 | 19.08.1992 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.07.1989 | 20.03.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Birkholm Laursen | 01.07.1989 | 16.12.2004 | bestyrelse |
Wenche Hjorth Melchiors | 01.07.1989 | 16.12.2004 | bestyrelse |
Majken Hjorth Hjort | 01.07.1989 | 16.12.2004 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Christian Melchiors | 01.07.1989 | 19.08.1992 | bestyrelse |