Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Noel Martin Nugent | 12.05.1998 | 25.02.2002 | direktion |
Jørgen Michael Pramming | 12.05.1998 | 12.05.1998 | direktion |
Henrik Ernst Seifert | 12.05.1998 | 12.05.1998 | direktion |
Orla Rasmussen | 05.02.1993 | 31.03.1993 | direktion |
Jørgen Michael Pramming | 01.07.1989 | 05.02.1993 | direktion |
Henrik Ernst Seifert | 01.07.1989 | 05.02.1993 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.07.1989 | 10.04.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Pathuel | 04.05.1999 | 25.02.2002 | bestyrelse |
Jes Olesen | 04.05.1999 | 25.02.2002 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Ernst Seifert | 12.05.1998 | 25.02.2002 | bestyrelse |
Noel Martin Nugent | 12.05.1998 | 25.02.2002 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Michael Pramming | 12.05.1998 | 25.02.2002 | formand |