Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Ole Carlsen | 01.07.1989 | 29.12.2003 | direktion |
Niels Ole Carlsen | 01.07.1989 | 11.05.1993 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.07.1989 | 16.03.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Dalskov | 01.07.1989 | 29.12.2003 | bestyrelse |
Niels Ole Carlsen | 01.07.1989 | 29.12.2003 | bestyrelse |
Torben Svanberg | 01.07.1989 | 29.12.2003 | formand |