Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Endrup Jacobsen | 01.06.1989 | 31.12.2003 | direktion |
William Daniel Brüel | 01.06.1989 | 28.08.1992 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.06.1989 | 17.01.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Finn Larsen | 27.04.1996 | 31.12.2003 | bestyrelse |
Hans Endrup Jacobsen | 01.06.1989 | 31.12.2003 | bestyrelse |
Steen Holbek | 01.06.1989 | 31.12.2003 | bestyrelse |
Asger Oluf Nielsen | 01.06.1989 | 27.04.1996 | bestyrelse |