Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erling Keller Rosendahl | 01.06.1996 | 14.04.1999 | direktion |
Stig Christensen | 01.07.1989 | 01.06.1996 | direktion |
Poul Hartvig Nielsen | 01.07.1989 | 05.01.1995 | direktion |
Christian Foldberg Rovsing | 01.07.1989 | 27.03.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Stig Christensen | 01.07.1989 | 14.04.1999 | bestyrelse |
Finn Dahlgaard | 01.07.1989 | 14.04.1999 | bestyrelse |
Vagn Holck-Andersen | 01.07.1989 | 14.04.1999 | formand |
Henning Skovmose | 01.07.1989 | 05.01.1995 | bestyrelse |
Poul Hartvig Nielsen | 01.07.1989 | 05.01.1995 | bestyrelse |
Alexander Michael Schaumann | 01.07.1989 | 27.03.1992 | bestyrelse |
Torsten Wilhelm Press | 01.07.1989 | 27.03.1992 | bestyrelse |