Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lone Lindqvist Hansen | 01.05.1989 | 30.09.1998 | direktion |
Verner Vincents | 01.05.1989 | 30.09.1998 | direktion |
Peter Henry Christensen | 01.05.1989 | 17.06.1991 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.05.1989 | 12.02.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Vincents | 01.05.1989 | 30.09.1998 | bestyrelse |
Lone Lindqvist Hansen | 01.05.1989 | 30.09.1998 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Vincents | 01.05.1989 | 30.09.1998 | bestyrelse |
Aksel Hansen | 01.05.1989 | 14.10.1994 | bestyrelse |
Peter Henry Christensen | 01.05.1989 | 17.06.1991 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1989 | 12.02.1990 | bestyrelse |