Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Bent Hartmeyer | 01.05.1989 | 12.11.1993 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1989 | 02.10.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Bent Hartmeyer | 01.05.1989 | 12.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Schytte | 01.05.1989 | 12.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Doris Karentine Hartmeyer | 01.05.1989 | 12.11.1993 | formand |
Ole Poul Rasmussen | 01.05.1989 | 05.02.1992 | bestyrelse |
Hans Rasmussen | 01.05.1989 | 05.02.1992 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.05.1989 | 02.10.1989 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1989 | 02.10.1989 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.05.1989 | 02.10.1989 | formand |