Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Timmy Albanis | 01.05.1989 | 06.09.1990 | direktion |
Anne-Margrethe Lelakis | 01.05.1989 | 27.02.1990 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.05.1989 | 24.10.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bill Albanis | 01.05.1989 | 06.09.1990 | bestyrelse |
Timmy Albanis | 01.05.1989 | 06.09.1990 | bestyrelse |
Anne-Margrethe Lelakis | 01.05.1989 | 27.02.1990 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1989 | 24.10.1989 | bestyrelse |