Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Joacim Lars Bruus-Jensen | 10.05.2007 | 07.09.2009 | direktion |
Claus Jesper Bruus-Jensen | 01.05.1989 | 10.05.2007 | direktion |
Ann Bruus-Jensen | 01.05.1989 | 01.02.1991 | direktion |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.05.1989 | 01.11.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Svein Harald Sørensen | 03.11.2008 | 07.09.2009 | bestyrelse |
Joacim Lars Bruus-Jensen | 10.05.2007 | 07.09.2009 | bestyrelse |
Claus Jesper Bruus-Jensen | 10.05.2007 | 07.09.2009 | formand |
Jens Storkfelt | 29.03.1999 | 03.11.2008 | bestyrelse |
Ann Bruus-Jensen | 01.05.1989 | 29.03.1999 | bestyrelse |