Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ann Bruus-Jensen | 19.10.1992 | 17.03.1994 | direktion |
Klaus Lovsø Nielsen | 01.04.1989 | 19.10.1992 | direktion |
Niels Erik Hansen | 01.04.1989 | 26.03.1992 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.04.1989 | 31.08.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Torben Lund | 19.10.1992 | 17.03.1994 | bestyrelse |
Ann Bruus-Jensen | 19.10.1992 | 17.03.1994 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Bruus-Jensen | 01.04.1989 | 17.03.1994 | formand |
Mogens Trygve Lied Flagstad | 01.04.1989 | 19.10.1992 | bestyrelse |
Kurt Flemming Andersen | 01.04.1989 | 19.10.1992 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Lovsø Nielsen | 01.04.1989 | 19.10.1992 | bestyrelse |
Niels Erik Hansen | 01.04.1989 | 26.03.1992 | bestyrelse |
Dorrit Wicky Hansen | 01.04.1989 | 18.02.1991 | bestyrelse |
Kirsten Wilhjelm | 01.04.1989 | 18.02.1991 | formand |
Johan Henrik Thaulow Schlüter | 01.04.1989 | 16.10.1990 | bestyrelse |
Keld Ditlev Pedersen | 01.04.1989 | 16.10.1990 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.04.1989 | 31.08.1989 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.04.1989 | 31.08.1989 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.04.1989 | 31.08.1989 | formand |