Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Nils Elsøe Jensen | 01.04.1989 | 24.01.2011 | direktion |
Jan Christoffersen | 01.04.1989 | 27.07.1990 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.04.1989 | 30.06.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Morten Fisker | 01.04.1989 | 24.01.2011 | bestyrelse |
Nils Elsøe Jensen | 01.04.1989 | 24.01.2011 | bestyrelse |
Michael Rasmussen | 01.04.1989 | 24.11.2009 | formand |
Jan Christoffersen | 01.04.1989 | 10.03.1998 | bestyrelse |
Vagn Louis Hansen | 01.04.1989 | 27.05.1991 | bestyrelse |
Poul Christensen | 01.04.1989 | 27.05.1991 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.04.1989 | 30.06.1989 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.04.1989 | 30.06.1989 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.04.1989 | 30.06.1989 | formand |