Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Henning Plenge Jacobsen | 02.02.1989 | 15.05.1996 | direktion |
Niels Erik Westen-Jensen | 02.02.1989 | 24.05.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Christian Emborg | 02.02.1989 | 15.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Hans Jørgen Hansen | 02.02.1989 | 15.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jens Bjerregaard | 02.02.1989 | 15.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Erik Emborg | 02.02.1989 | 15.03.1991 | bestyrelse |
Hans Henning Plenge Jacobsen | 02.02.1989 | 15.11.1989 | bestyrelse |