Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Aaquist | 21.02.1997 | 29.07.2005 | direktion |
Per Jensen Thorsager | 25.03.1996 | 29.07.2005 | direktion |
Ejnar Andersen | 01.02.1989 | 25.03.1996 | direktion |
Kurt Eigil Godskesen | 01.02.1989 | 16.08.1990 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.02.1989 | 15.11.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Jensen Thorsager | 25.03.1996 | 25.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Ejnar Andersen | 01.02.1989 | 25.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
August Christian Wille | 01.02.1989 | 25.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Lauri Olavi Makela | 01.02.1989 | 09.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Kurt Eigil Godskesen | 01.02.1989 | 09.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1989 | 15.11.1989 | bestyrelse |