Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Rievers Buhl | 01.02.1989 | 30.06.1998 | direktion |
Anni Elise Buhl | 01.02.1989 | 22.10.1991 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.02.1989 | 03.08.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1989 | 03.08.1989 | bestyrelse |