Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Wilken Horneman | 01.01.1989 | 28.11.1991 | direktion |
Thorkild Meyer Jensen | 01.01.1989 | 25.10.1990 | direktion |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.01.1989 | 15.09.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Andreas Thulstrup | 01.01.1989 | 28.11.1991 | bestyrelse |
Helge Schaumann | 01.01.1989 | 28.11.1991 | bestyrelse |
Finn Schaumann | 01.01.1989 | 28.11.1991 | formand |
Eiler Andersen | 01.01.1989 | 28.11.1991 | næstformand |