Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Wilsbech | 15.06.2009 | 07.12.2010 | direktion |
Christl Zille Jensen | 28.04.2006 | 15.06.2009 | direktion |
Kim Hersland | 08.03.2006 | 28.04.2006 | direktion |
Christl Zille Jensen | 14.10.2002 | 08.03.2006 | direktion |
Jesper Frøslev-Jørgensen | 04.06.1997 | 14.10.2002 | direktion |
Ivan Liljebæk | 17.01.1996 | 03.09.1996 | direktion |
Antonio Pizziuti | 01.02.1989 | 04.06.1997 | direktion |
Peter Burchardt | 01.02.1989 | 17.01.1996 | direktion |
Maxim Vladimirovich Naumchenko | 01.02.1989 | 06.12.1995 | direktion |
David Truels Hansen | 01.02.1989 | 29.09.1995 | direktion |
Anders Vangsbjerg Sørensen | 01.02.1989 | 10.02.1995 | direktion |
Jesper Frøslev-Jørgensen | 01.02.1989 | 23.12.1993 | direktion |
Jakob Stilov | 01.02.1989 | 29.06.1993 | direktion |
Anders Vangsbjerg Sørensen | 01.02.1989 | 11.01.1993 | direktion |
Niels Bo Willum Caspersen | 01.02.1989 | 10.01.1992 | direktion |
Leif Hansen | 01.02.1989 | 20.04.1990 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1989 | 08.08.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Wilsbech | 30.04.2009 | 07.12.2010 | bestyrelse |
Martin Quaade Egana Castillo | 28.04.2008 | 07.12.2010 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Jensen | 28.04.2008 | 30.04.2009 | bestyrelse |
Kenneth Ottendal Öberg | 25.05.2007 | 28.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Finn Krogh Johannessen | 04.12.2006 | 28.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Christl Zille Jensen | 28.04.2006 | 07.12.2010 | bestyrelse |
Kim Hansen | 28.04.2006 | 28.04.2008 | formand |
Jan Hess | 28.04.2006 | 04.12.2006 | bestyrelse |
Kim Hersland | 20.03.2006 | 28.04.2006 | bestyrelse |
Eskild Kyhn | 20.03.2006 | 28.04.2006 | formand |
Anja Kjærsgaard Jensen | 31.05.2005 | 20.03.2006 | bestyrelse |
Hanne Kjærsgaard | 31.05.2005 | 20.03.2006 | formand |
Niels Erik Rasmussen | 01.12.2004 | 31.05.2005 | bestyrelse |
Kenneth Ottendal Öberg | 05.04.2004 | 31.05.2005 | bestyrelse |
Ole Vesterby Mortensen | 05.04.2004 | 01.12.2004 | bestyrelse |
Christl Zille Jensen | 14.10.2002 | 20.03.2006 | bestyrelse |
Jan Wilsbech | 14.10.2002 | 05.04.2004 | bestyrelse |
Solveig Louise Wilsbech | 14.10.2002 | 05.04.2004 | formand |
Eskild Kyhn | 29.10.1999 | 14.10.2002 | bestyrelse |
Claus Rosenberg Gotthard | 29.10.1999 | 14.10.2002 | formand |
Jesper Munk Laursen | 04.06.1997 | 29.10.1999 | bestyrelse |
Axel Ivan Rasmussen | 04.06.1997 | 29.10.1999 | formand |
Jesper Frøslev-Jørgensen | 17.01.1996 | 14.10.2002 | bestyrelse |
Amnon Fuchs | 17.01.1996 | 03.09.1996 | bestyrelse |
Ivan Liljebæk | 17.01.1996 | 03.09.1996 | bestyrelse |
Mike Hagh | 01.02.1989 | 04.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Antonio Pizziuti | 01.02.1989 | 04.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Peter Burchardt | 01.02.1989 | 17.01.1996 | bestyrelse |
Bjørn Skov Jørnvig | 01.02.1989 | 17.01.1996 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Smed Jørgensen | 01.02.1989 | 17.01.1996 | formand |
Konstatine Tchistiakov | 01.02.1989 | 06.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
Maxim Yurievich Chernopyatko | 01.02.1989 | 06.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
David Truels Hansen | 01.02.1989 | 29.09.1995 | bestyrelse |
Mark Menhardt | 01.02.1989 | 25.09.1995 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Frøslev-Jørgensen | 01.02.1989 | 23.12.1993 | bestyrelse |
Vladimir Braslavsky | 01.02.1989 | 23.12.1993 | bestyrelse |
Jakob Stilov | 01.02.1989 | 29.06.1993 | bestyrelse |
Lars Bræmer | 01.02.1989 | 29.06.1993 | bestyrelse |
Karen Gotthjælp Søeberg | 01.02.1989 | 29.06.1993 | bestyrelse |
Anders Vangsbjerg Sørensen | 01.02.1989 | 29.12.1992 | bestyrelse |
Niels Bo Willum Caspersen | 01.02.1989 | 10.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Ole Hjelt | 01.02.1989 | 10.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Emilie Haaning Olsen | 01.02.1989 | 10.01.1992 | formand |
Leif Hansen | 01.02.1989 | 20.04.1990 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.02.1989 | 08.08.1989 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1989 | 08.08.1989 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.02.1989 | 08.08.1989 | formand |