Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Pedersen | 07.02.1989 | 21.09.2010 | direktion |
Holger Pedersen | 07.02.1989 | 05.09.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Nina Pedersen | 27.06.2000 | 21.09.2010 | bestyrelse |
Jan Pedersen | 07.02.1989 | 21.09.2010 | bestyrelse |
Tom Pedersen | 07.02.1989 | 21.09.2010 | bestyrelse |
Holger Pedersen | 07.02.1989 | 27.06.2000 | bestyrelse |