Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bo Larsen | 01.12.1988 | 31.10.1996 | direktion |
Arne Knudsen | 01.12.1988 | 06.04.1992 | direktion |
Tom Petersen | 01.12.1988 | 06.02.1992 | direktion |
Bent Jensen | 01.12.1988 | 29.01.1992 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.12.1988 | 25.05.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Peter Drisdal Hansen | 01.12.1988 | 31.10.1996 | bestyrelse |
Ole Henrik Lund-Petersen | 01.12.1988 | 31.10.1996 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Villy Sørensen | 01.12.1988 | 31.10.1996 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Legarth | 01.12.1988 | 06.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Arne Knudsen | 01.12.1988 | 06.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Hakon Mogens Fjeldberg | 01.12.1988 | 06.04.1992 | formand |
Tom Petersen | 01.12.1988 | 06.02.1992 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Andersen | 01.12.1988 | 29.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Ove Jensen | 01.12.1988 | 29.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.12.1988 | 25.05.1989 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.12.1988 | 25.05.1989 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.12.1988 | 25.05.1989 | formand |