Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ebbe Mondrup | 01.01.1989 | 01.04.1993 | direktion |
Else Marie Mondrup | 01.01.1989 | 01.04.1993 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.01.1989 | 09.03.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Morten Kofmann | 01.01.1989 | 29.05.1991 | bestyrelse |
Ebbe Mondrup | 01.01.1989 | 29.05.1991 | bestyrelse |
Else Marie Mondrup | 01.01.1989 | 29.05.1991 | bestyrelse |
Bent Ole Neubert | 01.01.1989 | 18.03.1991 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.01.1989 | 09.03.1989 | bestyrelse |