Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jesper Johannesen | 01.02.2011 | 18.09.2013 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jette Larsen | 08.05.2013 | 18.09.2013 | formand |
Kristian May | 23.03.2012 | 18.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Jukku Mølgaard | 23.03.2012 | 18.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Lissi Olsen | 23.03.2012 | 08.05.2013 | formand |
Kenneth Taylor Hansen | 01.02.2011 | 23.03.2012 | bestyrelse |
Kenneth Bøjler | 01.02.2011 | 23.03.2012 | bestyrelse |
Erik Jensen Nørskov | 01.02.2011 | 23.03.2012 | formand |