Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Brogaard Bertelsen | 01.09.2006 | 11.09.2020 | direktion |
Kim Sønderby | 01.09.2006 | 11.09.2020 | direktion |
Karl Henrik Henriksen | 01.09.2006 | 01.09.2006 | direktion |
Kurt Rindom | 02.11.1988 | 25.08.2006 | direktion |
Jens Ørgaard Hansen | 02.11.1988 | 15.06.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Karl Henrik Henriksen | 01.09.2006 | 11.09.2020 | formand |