Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Uffe Gad Jørgensen | 01.10.1988 | 22.06.1999 | direktion |
Nils Skibsted | 01.10.1988 | 22.06.1999 | adm. dir |
Mogens Jørgensen | 01.10.1988 | 11.09.1991 | direktion |
Hans Knudsen | 01.10.1988 | 11.09.1991 | direktion |
Niels Rasmussen | 01.10.1988 | 20.12.1990 | direktion |
Søren Holm | 01.10.1988 | 20.12.1990 | direktion |
Sven Gunnar Schough | 01.10.1988 | 01.06.1990 | direktion |
Peter Leschly | 01.10.1988 | 07.02.1990 | direktion |
Erik Møller | 01.10.1988 | 07.02.1990 | adm. dir |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.10.1988 | 20.03.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Holger Søndergaard | 01.10.1988 | 22.06.1999 | bestyrelse |
Karen Margrethe Juul Pedersen | 01.10.1988 | 22.06.1999 | bestyrelse |
Bent Johansson | 01.10.1988 | 22.06.1999 | bestyrelse |
Bent Mogens Hansen | 01.10.1988 | 22.06.1999 | bestyrelse |
Bent Gotfred Lundberg Olesen | 01.10.1988 | 22.06.1999 | bestyrelse |
Lars Jørgen Søndergaard | 01.10.1988 | 22.06.1999 | bestyrelse |
Kirsten Karoline Torpe | 01.10.1988 | 22.06.1999 | personlig_suppleant |
Leif Winther Kristensen | 01.10.1988 | 22.06.1999 | personlig_suppleant |
Torben Gustav Garth-Grüner | 01.10.1988 | 22.06.1999 | formand |
Knud Waldof Kalsgaard Jakobsen | 01.10.1988 | 15.09.1992 | formand |
Knud-Erik Borup | 01.10.1988 | 20.05.1992 | bestyrelse |
Henning Leo Sørensen | 01.10.1988 | 17.02.1992 | bestyrelse |
Karen Margrethe Juul Pedersen | 01.10.1988 | 17.02.1992 | personlig_suppleant |
Kaare Vagner Jensen | 01.10.1988 | 11.09.1991 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.10.1988 | 20.03.1989 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.10.1988 | 20.03.1989 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.10.1988 | 20.03.1989 | bestyrelse |