Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
David Bretton-Meyer | 30.09.1988 | 09.11.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
David Bretton-Meyer | 30.09.1988 | 09.11.2005 | bestyrelse |
Knud Erik Linde | 30.09.1988 | 09.11.2005 | bestyrelse |
Erik Gaarn | 30.09.1988 | 09.11.2005 | bestyrelse |
Jan Aarsø Nielsen | 30.09.1988 | 02.12.1993 | bestyrelse |
Knud Petri | 30.09.1988 | 19.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Jette Bretton-Meyer | 30.09.1988 | 17.09.1992 | bestyrelse |