Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Bernhard Pfeiffer | 01.08.1988 | 24.03.1999 | direktion |
Hans Jørgen Krebs | 01.08.1988 | 24.03.1999 | direktion |
Leif Krister Nord | 01.08.1988 | 04.03.1993 | direktion |
John Lonergan | 01.08.1988 | 30.07.1992 | direktion |
John Peter Frank | 01.08.1988 | 13.08.1990 | direktion |
John Kindt-Larsen | 01.08.1988 | 21.06.1990 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.08.1988 | 16.12.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Bernhard Pfeiffer | 01.08.1988 | 30.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Hans Jørgen Krebs | 01.08.1988 | 30.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Finn Koch | 01.08.1988 | 30.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Erling Bardensted Folker | 01.08.1988 | 17.05.1993 | bestyrelse |
Erik Tegtmeier Svaneborg | 01.08.1988 | 04.03.1993 | bestyrelse |
John Claus Miiller | 01.08.1988 | 04.03.1993 | bestyrelse |
Per Sølve Grøttner | 01.08.1988 | 04.03.1993 | bestyrelse |
John Lonergan | 01.08.1988 | 30.07.1992 | bestyrelse |
John Kindt-Larsen | 01.08.1988 | 13.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Denis Waldeck | 01.08.1988 | 13.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Udo Mader | 01.08.1988 | 13.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Werner Reinkendorff | 01.08.1988 | 22.12.1989 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.08.1988 | 16.12.1988 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.08.1988 | 16.12.1988 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.08.1988 | 16.12.1988 | formand |