Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Hostrup Søderquist | 01.08.1988 | 02.08.1989 | direktion |
Hanne Lauritzen | 01.08.1988 | 11.05.1989 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.08.1988 | 28.11.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Hostrup Søderquist | 01.08.1988 | 28.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Kjeld Andersen | 01.08.1988 | 28.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Erik Høyer Askbo | 01.08.1988 | 02.08.1989 | formand |
Hanne Lauritzen | 01.08.1988 | 21.02.1989 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.08.1988 | 28.11.1988 | bestyrelse |