Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Linda Halberg Damgaard | 01.08.1988 | 18.08.1994 | direktion |
Alen Stig Andersen | 01.08.1988 | 20.07.1990 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.08.1988 | 20.07.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.08.1988 | 20.07.1989 | bestyrelse |