Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Claus Keimer Jørgensen | 01.08.1988 | 12.09.1996 | direktion |
Philip Gelbjerg-Hansen | 01.08.1988 | 18.05.1993 | direktion |
Karsten Vangsgaard Jensen | 01.08.1988 | 12.07.1989 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.08.1988 | 21.11.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Christian Godfred de Dompierre de Jonquières | 01.08.1988 | 07.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Philip Gelbjerg-Hansen | 01.08.1988 | 07.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Per Jørgen Philip Gelbjerg-Hansen | 01.08.1988 | 07.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Karsten Vangsgaard Jensen | 01.08.1988 | 12.07.1989 | bestyrelse |