Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tove Vestergaard Christiansen | 01.06.1988 | 22.04.2004 | direktion |
Flemming Harald Aagaard | 01.06.1988 | 10.04.1996 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.06.1988 | 08.11.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tove Vestergaard Christiansen | 01.06.1988 | 10.04.1996 | bestyrelse |