Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jonas Benjamin Pavia Avgo Heilmann | 14.11.2005 | 22.09.2006 | direktion |
Kristoffer Morten Mikael Ole Petersen | 23.08.2004 | 14.11.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jonas Benjamin Pavia Avgo Heilmann | 14.11.2005 | 22.09.2006 | bestyrelse |
Jakob Kristian Mikael Elias Hendrik Josefsen | 14.11.2005 | 22.09.2006 | bestyrelse |
Apollo Pavia Tønnes Gudmand Egede | 14.11.2005 | 22.09.2006 | bestyrelse |
Hans Johannes Jakob Karl Mathiessen | 14.11.2005 | 22.09.2006 | formand |
Lars Jens Karl Esaias Geraae | 20.04.2005 | 22.09.2006 | bestyrelse |
Peter Henrik William Heilmann Petersen | 23.08.2004 | 22.09.2006 | bestyrelse |
Kristoffer Morten Mikael Ole Petersen | 23.08.2004 | 22.09.2006 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Bent Enequist | 23.08.2004 | 20.04.2005 | bestyrelse |