Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Frank Rasmussen | 10.09.2004 | 11.06.2012 | direktion |
Michael Frank Rasmussen | 10.09.2004 | 09.12.2011 | direktion |
Michael Frank Rasmussen | 10.09.2004 | 09.11.2006 | direktion |
Arne Herholdt Møller Petersen | 20.06.1988 | 10.09.2004 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anders Peter Rousing | 29.03.2011 | 22.03.2012 | bestyrelse |
Anders Peter Rousing | 29.03.2011 | 09.12.2011 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Erikstrup | 20.11.2008 | 22.03.2012 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Erikstrup | 20.11.2008 | 09.12.2011 | bestyrelse |
John Bylov Frandsen | 25.10.2007 | 29.03.2011 | bestyrelse |
Knud Helkjær | 03.10.2007 | 10.11.2008 | formand |
Michael Frank Rasmussen | 08.11.2006 | 22.03.2012 | bestyrelse |
Michael Frank Rasmussen | 08.11.2006 | 09.12.2011 | bestyrelse |
Lars Krüger | 08.11.2006 | 25.10.2007 | bestyrelse |
Lars Blach | 08.11.2006 | 03.10.2007 | formand |
Lars Krüger | 08.11.2006 | 09.11.2006 | bestyrelse |
Michael Frank Rasmussen | 08.11.2006 | 09.11.2006 | bestyrelse |
Lars Blach | 08.11.2006 | 09.11.2006 | formand |