Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Hans Jensen | 01.04.1988 | 31.01.1994 | direktion |
Knud-Helge Andreasen | 01.04.1988 | 31.01.1994 | adm. dir |
Jørgen Krumbæk Hansen | 01.04.1988 | 15.04.1992 | direktion |
Robert Gordon Zimmermann | 01.04.1988 | 05.02.1991 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.04.1988 | 23.11.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Leon Høgberg | 01.04.1988 | 31.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Hans Jensen | 01.04.1988 | 31.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Philip Michael Wulff Nathansen | 01.04.1988 | 31.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Erik Andersson | 01.04.1988 | 31.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Anders Torbøl | 01.04.1988 | 31.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Pedersen | 01.04.1988 | 31.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Filip Joachim Nielsen | 01.04.1988 | 31.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Per Norring Mandal Jensen | 01.04.1988 | 31.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Knud-Helge Andreasen | 01.04.1988 | 31.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Ole Brorsen Nielsen | 01.04.1988 | 15.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Torben Agner | 01.04.1988 | 15.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Johannesen | 01.04.1988 | 15.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Krumbæk Hansen | 01.04.1988 | 15.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Robert Gordon Zimmermann | 01.04.1988 | 05.02.1991 | bestyrelse |
Ove Carsten Eriksen | 01.04.1988 | 10.11.1989 | bestyrelse |
Eigil Nørmark Lund | 01.04.1988 | 10.11.1989 | bestyrelse |