Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Kruse Hansen | 01.05.1988 | 24.02.1998 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.05.1988 | 09.09.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Torben Pedersen | 01.05.1988 | 24.02.1998 | bestyrelse |
Orla Damgaard Larsen | 01.05.1988 | 24.02.1998 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Uffe Bonnesen | 01.05.1988 | 24.02.1998 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Kruse Hansen | 01.05.1988 | 24.02.1998 | bestyrelse |
Finn Heilbo | 01.05.1988 | 30.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Fritz Niels Bonde | 01.05.1988 | 09.08.1994 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1988 | 09.09.1988 | bestyrelse |