Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Agnes Marie Holm | 01.11.1992 | 15.04.1993 | direktion |
Peter Refstrup | 01.05.1988 | 01.11.1992 | direktion |
Bent Høy | 01.05.1988 | 13.04.1992 | direktion |
Günther Brinkel | 01.05.1988 | 25.10.1991 | direktion |
Mogens Jensen | 01.05.1988 | 28.09.1990 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1988 | 05.10.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Agnes Marie Holm | 01.11.1992 | 15.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Johnny Bjørndahl Jensen | 01.11.1992 | 15.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Lars Ole Lindemann Hansen | 01.11.1992 | 15.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Caroline Grundtvig Refstrup | 01.05.1988 | 01.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Hanne Grundtvig Refstrup | 01.05.1988 | 01.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Peter Refstrup | 01.05.1988 | 01.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Søren Friis Smith Knudsen | 01.05.1988 | 13.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Bent Høy | 01.05.1988 | 13.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Anders Kirkegaard | 01.05.1988 | 13.04.1992 | formand |
Poul Georg Jensen | 01.05.1988 | 25.10.1991 | bestyrelse |
Palle Buhl Jørgensen | 01.05.1988 | 25.10.1991 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Bjerre | 01.05.1988 | 25.10.1991 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.05.1988 | 05.10.1988 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.05.1988 | 05.10.1988 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1988 | 05.10.1988 | bestyrelse |