Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kaj Christensen | 01.05.1988 | 28.01.1993 | direktion |
Harri Gunnar Honkanen | 01.05.1988 | 28.06.1990 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1988 | 31.10.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Palle Reimer Hansen | 01.05.1988 | 28.01.1993 | bestyrelse |
Kaj Christensen | 01.05.1988 | 28.01.1993 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Rask Nielsen | 01.05.1988 | 28.01.1993 | formand |
Harri Gunnar Honkanen | 01.05.1988 | 28.06.1990 | bestyrelse |
Erik Kruse | 01.05.1988 | 28.06.1990 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Herluf Torp | 01.05.1988 | 28.06.1990 | formand |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.05.1988 | 31.10.1988 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.05.1988 | 31.10.1988 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1988 | 31.10.1988 | bestyrelse |