Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Alfred Wium-Andersen | 15.03.2002 | 22.10.2004 | direktion |
Bjørn Wium-Andersen | 15.03.2002 | 15.03.2002 | direktion |
Preben Bjarne Christensen | 01.05.1988 | 15.03.2002 | direktion |
Finn Vilstrup | 01.05.1988 | 08.01.1992 | direktion |
Preben Bjarne Christensen | 01.05.1988 | 06.12.1989 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1988 | 17.08.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anna Wium-Andersen | 06.12.2002 | 22.10.2004 | bestyrelse |
Stig Clement Brendstrup | 15.03.2002 | 22.10.2004 | bestyrelse |
Bjørn Wium-Andersen | 15.03.2002 | 06.12.2002 | formand |
Poul Alfred Wium-Andersen | 01.05.1988 | 22.10.2004 | bestyrelse |
Finn Vilstrup | 01.05.1988 | 15.03.2002 | bestyrelse |
Preben Bjarne Christensen | 01.05.1988 | 15.03.2002 | bestyrelse |
Harald Johannsen | 01.05.1988 | 21.11.1994 | bestyrelse |
Preben Bjarne Christensen | 01.05.1988 | 06.12.1989 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.05.1988 | 17.08.1988 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1988 | 17.08.1988 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.05.1988 | 17.08.1988 | formand |