Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Ulsøe | 06.03.2001 | 31.10.2002 | adm. dir |
Knut Ronny Christer Roos | 06.03.2001 | 06.03.2001 | adm. dir |
Niels Jørgen Tobiasen | 29.05.1996 | 01.03.1997 | direktion |
Hans Peter Christensen | 01.04.1988 | 29.05.1996 | direktion |
Peter Mostgaard | 01.04.1988 | 27.12.1994 | direktion |
Ole Skjold Larsen | 01.04.1988 | 01.03.1994 | direktion |
Hans Mellstrøm | 01.04.1988 | 08.07.1991 | direktion |
Bruno Schultz | 01.04.1988 | 02.03.1990 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.04.1988 | 01.12.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jesper Scharff | 01.01.2002 | 31.10.2002 | formand |
Ole Ulsøe | 06.03.2001 | 31.10.2002 | bestyrelse |
Michael Lemvig | 06.03.2001 | 31.10.2002 | bestyrelse |
Kaj Bækgaard | 06.03.2001 | 31.10.2002 | bestyrelse |
Knut Ronny Christer Roos | 06.03.2001 | 01.01.2002 | formand |
Crister Stjernfelt | 01.04.1999 | 06.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Kjeld Olov Larsson | 01.04.1999 | 06.03.2001 | formand |
Niels Jørgen Tobiasen | 29.05.1996 | 04.03.1997 | bestyrelse |
Leif Carlsson | 01.04.1988 | 06.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Hans Peter Christensen | 01.04.1988 | 29.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Tord Lennart Wilkne | 01.04.1988 | 29.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Peter Flemming Alsted | 01.04.1988 | 06.07.1995 | bestyrelse |
Peter Mostgaard | 01.04.1988 | 27.12.1994 | bestyrelse |
Ole Skjold Larsen | 01.04.1988 | 01.03.1994 | bestyrelse |
Hans Mellstrøm | 01.04.1988 | 01.03.1994 | bestyrelse |
Margit Lisa Gade Nielsen | 01.04.1988 | 08.07.1991 | bestyrelse |
Bruno Schultz | 01.04.1988 | 02.03.1990 | bestyrelse |
Hans-Ole Bång | 01.04.1988 | 02.03.1990 | bestyrelse |