Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erich Georg Bernhard Reck | 01.04.1988 | 12.05.1993 | direktion |
Lejf Dalen Pedersen | 01.04.1988 | 26.05.1992 | direktion |
Anette Sveistrup | 01.04.1988 | 08.02.1991 | direktion |
Erich Georg Bernhard Reck | 01.04.1988 | 31.03.1989 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.04.1988 | 12.09.1988 | direktion |