Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Twisselmann Horn | 17.01.1985 | 16.08.1993 | direktion |
Steen Hans Duholm | 17.01.1985 | 16.08.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Twisselmann Horn | 17.01.1985 | 16.08.1993 | bestyrelse |
Steen Hans Duholm | 17.01.1985 | 16.08.1993 | bestyrelse |
Alfred Friedrich Kuhne | 17.01.1985 | 16.08.1993 | bestyrelse |
Torben Ingemann | 17.01.1985 | 16.08.1993 | formand |
Ole Hjelt | 17.01.1985 | 09.07.1993 | bestyrelse |
Jurgen Albert Franz Pollahn | 17.01.1985 | 22.05.1992 | bestyrelse |
Jurgen Koop | 17.01.1985 | 22.05.1992 | formand |
Otto Hans David Werther | 17.01.1985 | 24.08.1990 | formand |