Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erling Munkholm | 01.07.2002 | 02.09.2009 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erling Munkholm | 26.02.2008 | 02.09.2009 | bestyrelse |
Eli Ulletved Pedersen | 26.02.2008 | 02.09.2009 | bestyrelse |
Suban Munkholm | 26.02.2008 | 02.09.2009 | formand |
Erling Munkholm | 01.07.2002 | 27.09.2002 | bestyrelse |
Svend Junge Pedersen | 01.07.2002 | 27.09.2002 | bestyrelse |
Niels Pedersen | 01.07.2002 | 27.09.2002 | bestyrelse |