Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Jørn Assersen | 06.12.1995 | 07.10.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ib Thrane | 28.03.1996 | 22.01.2007 | formand |
Niels Jørn Assersen | 06.12.1995 | 07.10.2008 | bestyrelse |
Poul Erik Assersen | 12.03.1988 | 07.10.2008 | bestyrelse |
Lars Assersen | 12.03.1988 | 07.10.2008 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Peter Wind | 12.03.1988 | 15.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
Henning Assersen | 12.03.1988 | 06.02.1995 | bestyrelse |
Søren Kristian Assersen | 12.03.1988 | 04.11.1994 | bestyrelse |
Niels Jørn Assersen | 12.03.1988 | 04.11.1994 | bestyrelse |
Lars Assersen | 12.03.1988 | 04.11.1994 | bestyrelse |