Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Svend Damgård Olesen | 01.01.1988 | 03.02.2015 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Timmermann Mortensen | 17.12.2008 | 03.02.2015 | bestyrelse |
Svend Damgård Olesen | 29.12.1998 | 03.02.2015 | bestyrelse |
Lone Timmermann Olesen | 01.07.1998 | 03.02.2015 | bestyrelse |
Ella Kathrine Olesen | 01.07.1998 | 17.12.2008 | bestyrelse |