Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Bjørn Leisby | 11.05.1987 | 11.04.2014 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Paul Bløcher | 11.05.1987 | 15.04.1997 | bestyrelse |
Per Bjørn Leisby | 11.05.1987 | 15.04.1997 | bestyrelse |
Gyrithe Leisby | 11.05.1987 | 15.04.1997 | bestyrelse |
Lars Bjørn Teisbæk | 11.05.1987 | 06.07.1992 | bestyrelse |