Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Tulinius | 01.03.1988 | 22.11.2009 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.03.1988 | 06.12.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Knud Erik Hald Aunsholt | 27.11.1996 | 22.10.2008 | bestyrelse |
Jens Tulinius | 01.03.1988 | 24.09.2009 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Jørgensen Dall | 01.03.1988 | 24.09.2009 | formand |
Susanne Grau | 01.03.1988 | 27.11.1996 | formand |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.03.1988 | 06.12.1988 | bestyrelse |