Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Løcke | 01.03.1988 | 20.09.1993 | direktion |
Kai Winter | 01.03.1988 | 31.01.1989 | direktion |
Kim Weis Hansen | 01.03.1988 | 31.01.1989 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.03.1988 | 21.10.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.03.1988 | 21.10.1988 | bestyrelse |