Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Pedersen | 25.07.2001 | 23.05.2016 | direktion |
Erik Pedersen | 25.07.2001 | 31.05.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Pedersen | 31.05.2007 | 19.04.2010 | bestyrelse |
Esper Goul Dueholm | 31.05.2007 | 19.04.2010 | bestyrelse |
Niels Aagaard Andersen | 31.05.2007 | 19.04.2010 | formand |